Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFASSETT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01495
Date Filed2019-05-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCAMILLE FASSETT
Case DescriptionCamille Fassett submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning hacker Adrian Lamo. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Fassett filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-221COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6140661) filed by CAMILLE FASSETT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-222NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CAMILLE FASSETT (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-23Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmc) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-233SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-06-214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 6/3/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/3/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/3/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/3/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-277ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by July 15, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/1/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/15/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-128Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-12MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 8 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a further joint status report by September 13, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/12/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-08-069NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of CAMILLE FASSETT (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-09-1310Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-16MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 10 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report by October 11, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/16/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/11/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-10-1111Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-15MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 11 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report by December 5, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/15/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2019. (nbn) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-12-0512Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 12 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall submit a further Joint Status Report by March 5, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/6/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2020-03-0313Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMILLE FASSETT. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 13 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall submit a further Joint Status Report by June 5, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/3/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/5/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-2614Unopposed MOTION to Stay by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to on 3/27/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 03/26/2020)
2020-03-26MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 14 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS that the Defendant shall file a status report by April 28, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/26/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
2020-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/28/2020. Case Stayed. (nbn) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-04-2815STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-28MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 15 Status Report and ORDERS that Defendant shall file a further status report by May 28, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/28/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/28/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-05-2816STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-28MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 16 Status Report and ORDERS that Defendant shall file a further status report by June 29, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/28/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/29/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-2917STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 17 Status Report and ORDERS that Defendant shall file a further status report by July 29, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/29/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/29/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-2918STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 18 Status Report and ORDERS that Defendant shall file a further status report by August 31, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/30/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-08-3119STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-31MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 19 Status Report and ORDERS that Defendant shall file a further status report by October 1, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/31/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/1/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-10-0120STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 20 Status Report and ORDERS that Defendant shall file a further status report by November 1, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/1/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/1/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-11-0221STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 21 Status Report and ORDERS that Defendant shall file a further status report by December 1, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/2/2020. (lcds) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/1/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-3022STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 22 Status Report and ORDERS that Defendant shall file a further status report by January 5, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/30/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/5/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2021-01-0523STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 23 Status Report and ORDERS that it shall file a further status report by February 5, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/5/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/5/2021. (nbn) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-02-0424STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-04MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 24 Status Report and ORDERS that it shall file a further status report by March 5, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/4/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/5/2021. (nbn) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-03-0525STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 25 Status Report and ORDERS that it shall file a further status report by April 5, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/5/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/5/2021. (nbn) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-04-0726STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
2021-04-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Defendant's 26 Status Report and ORDERS that it shall file a further status report by May 5, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/7/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar