Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCatholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2019cv01511
Date Filed2019-05-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan
PlaintiffCatholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Catholic Legal Immigration Network submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the agency's interpretation of the statutory reunification requirement for Special Immigrant Juvenile Status. CLIMN also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and informed CLIMN that it was placing it in the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CLIMN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [45]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-221COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8026375.), filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons to ICE, # 5 Summons to MD US Attorney)(Magid, Creighton) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-222Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. (Magid, Creighton) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-233Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-234NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. or counsel for Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded here . Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded here , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/6/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-235Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/23/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-296(FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and initial pleadings, court orders and consent notice served on U.S. Attorney General on 5/24/2019, filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc..(Magid, Creighton) Modified on 5/31/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-297SUMMONS Returned Executed William Barr, Attorney General served on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-038SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. (Magid, Creighton) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-06Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-0710MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michelle S. Grant (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8060266.) by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.(Magid, Creighton) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-0711SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/23/2019.(Magid, Creighton) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-1112PAPERLESS ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michelle S Grant. Attorney Michelle S Grant will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-2313Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 06/23/2019)
2019-06-2414PAPERLESS ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/24/2019. (mbcs, Chambers) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-2315Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-2516PAPERLESS ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 8/7/2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/25/2019. (mbcs, Chambers) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-08-0717Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-0818PAPERLESS ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's Answer is due August 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/8/2019. (mbcs, Chambers) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-1219Consent MOTION to Establish Re-Processing and Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-1320CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/13/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-1521ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 19 Consent Motion Establish Re-Processing and Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule; USCIS shall answer Complaint by August 20, 2019; USCIS may re-file the Consent Motion, without first seeking a pre-motion conference with the Court per the Case Management Order, after answering the Complaint. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/15/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-1622ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-2023Consent MOTION to Establish Re-Processing and Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule (Renewed Motion) by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-09-0424SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/13/2020. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/29/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-0425PAPERLESS NOTICE. A RULE 16 CONFERENCE is scheduled for September 11, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 09111130 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties are reminded that they should be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Rule 16 Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (nrs, Chambers) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-0426PAPERLESS ORDER granting 23 Consent Motion to Establish Re-Processing and Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Any Motions for Summary Judgment, Briefs in Support, and the Record shall meet the requirements of the Case Management Order 20 . Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due October 23, 2019. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due November 22, 2019. Defendant's Reply to the Plaintiff's Opposition is due December 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/4/19. (nrs, Chambers) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-1127Case Management Conference held on 9/11/2019 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-2B.) (ss5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-1228ORDER that, by September 25,2019, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report advising the Court whether they consent to have this case transferred to a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/12/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-1629Consent to Magistrate Judge (Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-1930ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/19/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-1931ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re 30 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/19/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-2432(FILED IN ERROR) Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Modified on 9/25/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-2533QC NOTICE: 32 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Magistrate Judge - Consent to, located in Other Filings - Correspondence. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-2534Consent to Magistrate Judge (Magid, Creighton) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-2535LETTER ORDER regarding referral for all proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/25/2019. (jmm, Chambers) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-10-2336Consent MOTION for Extension of Time (Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule) by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-2437PAPERLESS ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant's motion for summary judgment is extended to 11/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 10/24/2019. (bc, Chambers) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-11-2038MOTION for Extension of Time (Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule Further) by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-2639PAPERLESS ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/26/2019. (bc, Chambers) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2020-01-0640Consent MOTION for Extension of Time (Second Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule Further) by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-0641PAPERLESS ORDER granting 40 Second Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 1/6/2020. (bc, Chambers) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-2742MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Eggleston Declaration)(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-02-1743RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc..(Grant, Michelle) (Entered: 02/17/2020)
2020-03-0244REPLY to Response to Motion re 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-09-2545MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/25/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-2546ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/25/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-10-0847Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Eggleston Declaration)(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar