Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFLOOR64, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01499
Date Filed2019-05-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffFLOOR64, INC.
PlaintiffMICHAEL MASNICK
Case DescriptionMichael Masnick, the president of Floor64, Inc. and operator of the website Techdirt, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning an agency press release announcing the seizure of a million websites as part of a global operation. Masnick specifically asked for a list of the domain names seized, court filings related to the seizures, and communications with industry representatives mentioned in the press release. Masnick also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request, citing Exemption 1 (national security) and Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). Masnick filed an administrative appeal. ICE granted Masnick's appeal and remanded the request for further processing. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Masnick filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6141292) filed by FLOOR64, INC., MICHAEL MASNICK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons Summons AG, # 11 Summons Summons ICE, # 12 Summons Summons US ATTY)(Valvo, Russel) (Attachment 9 replaced on 5/23/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FLOOR64, INC., MICHAEL MASNICK (Valvo, Russel) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/23/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-233NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Steven, Lee) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/31/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-234ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FLOOR64, INC., MICHAEL MASNICK. (zef, ) Modified on 5/23/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-23NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 4 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests was entered in error, duplicate entry. Filing already filed RE: ECF entry No. 2 . (zef, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-23Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-235SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/22/2019. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 5/23/2019 (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-238RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/23/19. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-319NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-05-3110ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/31/2019. (DM) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar