Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWATTLETON V. BERRYHILL
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01404
Date Filed2019-05-14
Date Closed2020-03-04
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffDAVID EARL WATTLETON
DefendantNANCY A. BERRYHILL Acting Commissioner of Social Security
DefendantSOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [22]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-14Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/14/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-141COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL filed by DAVID EARL WATTLETON.(zsb). (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-142MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID EARL WATTLETON (zsb) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-06-103PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/07/2019. (zeg). (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-244MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID EARL WATTLETON (zmc) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-245PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DAVID EARL WATTLETON (zmc) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-07-106ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/8/2019. (zeg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-10Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zeg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-107SUMMONS (3) Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) Modified on 7/15/2019 (zeg). (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-318RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NANCY A. BERRYHILL served on 7/25/2019 (zrdj) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-029NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of NANCY A. BERRYHILL, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-0510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/26/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/25/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-1211RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/9/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-2312MOTION for Summary Judgment by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-2913Order advising plaintiff to respond by 9/30/2019 to 12 Defendant's for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 8/29/19. (ms) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/30/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-09-1214Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DAVID EARL WATTLETON. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-2315MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by NANCY A. BERRYHILL (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-10-1016MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by NANCY A. BERRYHILL, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-18MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that 15 , 16 , Defendant's Motions for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Summary Judgment are GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its Reply by November 4, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 10/18/2019. (dm) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's reply to plaintiff's opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 11/4/2019. (tg) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-11-0417REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NANCY A. BERRYHILL, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-0518NOTICE by NANCY A. BERRYHILL, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-1819MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by DAVID EARL WATTLETON (zrdj) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-2720NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by William J. Chang on behalf of NANCY A. BERRYHILL Substituting for attorney JOSHUA ROGERS (Chang, William) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-11-2721RESPONSE re 19 MOTION for Leave to File filed by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Chang, William) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2020-01-15MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply is GRANTED and the Court will consider Plaintiff's Surreply, which is attached to the Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 1/15/2020. (dm) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-03-0322MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING the defendant's 12 motion for summary judgment as to the FOIA claim related to the plaintiff's February 2019 FOIA request. To the extent that the plaintiff has also challenged SSA's processing of his April 2019 Privacy Act Request, this claim is dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 3/3/2020. (dm) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-0323ORDER GRANTING the defendant's motion for summary judgment 12 as to the plaintiff's FOIA claim and further DISMISSING without prejudice the plaintiff's Privacy Act claim. See order and accompanying memorandum opinion 22 for details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 3/3/2020. (dm) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar