Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. Perdue et al
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2019cv01510
Date Filed2019-05-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Forest Service for records concerning a December 2017 intergovernmental agreement between the Arizona Department of Agriculture and the Forest Service. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and eventually provided two interim responses. Friends of Animals contacted the agency several times to check the status of its request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantGeorge Ervin Perdue, III "Sonny", in his official capacity as United States Secretary of Agriculture
DefendantUnited States Forest Service an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-281COMPLAINT against Sonny Perdue, United States Forest Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6708610)Attorney Courtney Renee McVean added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(McVean, Courtney) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-282Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-283SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-294MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01510-STV. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-295Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-296ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Consent Form due by 7/31/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. On or before August 7, 2019, the parties shall file a joint proposed schedulingorder in the form required pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/29/19. (morti, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar