Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01578
Date Filed2019-05-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning calendars and calendar entries for Shannon Royce, director of the HHS Center for Faith and Opportunity Initiatives. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-291COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6151949) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons as to USAO, # 4 Summons as to AG, # 5 Summons as to HHS)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-06-04Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-044STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/4/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/4/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/10/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 6/11/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar