Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTransgender Law Center et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv03032
Date Filed2019-05-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sallie Kim
PlaintiffTransgender Law Center
P.O. Box 70976
Oakland, CA 94612
510-587-9696
PlaintiffJolene K. Youngers as personal administrator for the wrongful death estate of Roxsana Hernandez
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantOffice for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties - United States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-311COMPLAINT for Declaratory & Injnctive Releif against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13398571). Filed by Transgender Law Center & Jolene K. Youngers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Meerkamper, Shawn) (Filed on 5/31/2019) Modified on 6/3/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-05-312Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/14/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-05-31Electronic filing error . Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17) Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-05-313Proposed Summons. (Meerkamper, Shawn) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-05-314Amended Civil Cover Sheet filed by Transgender Law Center & Jolene K. Youngers (Meerkamper, Shawn) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-035Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-036Summons Issued as to Defendants Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties - United States Department of Homeland Security, and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-147AFFIDAVIT of Service for NOTICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS, ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL, BROCHURE ENTITLED CONSENTING TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGES JURISDICTION IN THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA," and all other documents specified in Civil Local Rule 4-2. served on ICE & DHS on 6/14/19, filed by Transgender Law Center, Jolene K. Youngers. (Meerkamper, Shawn) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-148CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Transgender Law Center, Jolene K. Youngers.. (Meerkamper, Shawn) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-209NOTICE of Appearance by Gioconda R. Molinari (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-2010CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties - United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-07-1711ANSWER to Complaint byOffice for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties - United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 7/17/2019) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar