Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePro Publica, Inc. v. United States Food and Drug Administration
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv05178
Date Filed2019-06-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Valerie E. Caproni
PlaintiffPro Publica, Inc.
Case DescriptionProPublica submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning a series of 48 contracts which were listed by number. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ProPublica filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Food and Drug Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-031COMPLAINT against United States Food and Drug Administration. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17004584)Document filed by Pro Publica, Inc..(Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-032CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-033RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pro Publica, Inc..(Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-034REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Food and Drug Administration, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Pro Publica, Inc.. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-04CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-04Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-04Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-045ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Food and Drug Administration. (pc) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-196NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on August 9, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. (as further set forth in this Order). SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/19/2019) (kv) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-207AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on United States Food and Drug Administration on June 4, 2019. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Pro Publica, Inc.. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-07-088ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Food and Drug Administration.(Hogan, Alexander) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-119LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Alexander J. Hogan dated July 11, 2019. Document filed by United States Food and Drug Administration.(Hogan, Alexander) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-1110ORDER: granting 9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The August 9, 2019 conference is adjourned to September 27, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. The August 1, 2019 deadline to submit preconference materials is adjourned to September 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/11/2019) (ama) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar