Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePro Publica, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv05222
Date Filed2019-06-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Andrew L. Carter, Jr
PlaintiffPro Publica, Inc.
Case DescriptionProPublica submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning named contracts awarded by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U.S Customs and Border Protection. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. CBP told ProPublica that it was taking a 10-day extension of the statutory time limit for responding. However, after hearing nothing further from either agency concerning its requests, ProPublica filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-041COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17012366)Document filed by Pro Publica, Inc..(Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-042CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-043RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pro Publica, Inc..(Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-044REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Pro Publica, Inc.. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-05CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-05Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-05Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-055ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-07-086ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Homeland Security.(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-117ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear, in person, for an Initial Conference in Courtroom 1306 at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY, on July 24, 2019 at 10:30 a.m.. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1306, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/11/2019) (kv) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar