Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSHABAZZ v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01640
Date Filed2019-06-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffSABIR SHABAZZ
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (FBOP) or (BOP)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-03Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/03/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-031COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS filed by SABIR SHABAZZ. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zsb) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-032MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SABIR SHABAZZ (zsb) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-033PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by SABIR SHABAZZ (zsb) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-124ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $18.00 from Prison Account of Sabir Shabazz and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/11/2019. (zmc) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-17Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmc) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-175SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-07-086NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-087Letter to the Court from SABIR SHABAZZ "Leave to file granted Letter", Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/8/2019.(zrdj) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-098RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/20/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/20/2019. (ztd) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-159MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint by SABIR SHABAZZ (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint). "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 07/15/2019(jf) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-1510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/21/2019. (jf) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-16Partial Filing Fee Received from SABIR SHABAZZ in the amount of $18.00, receipt number: 4616099594. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-17MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint 9 is GRANTED. This action now pertains to four FOIA requests submitted by plaintiff to the Federal Bureau of Prisons: Information Request Nos. 2019-00256 and 2019-01103, and the requests dated April 1, 2019, and June 5, 2019, to which plaintiff alleges no tracking number has been assigned. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/17/19. (ms) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-1711MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 7 Letter by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-18MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer or other response to the complaint is due by August 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/18/19. (DMK) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar