Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRESTORE PUBLIC TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01677
Date Filed2019-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffRESTORE PUBLIC TRUST
Case DescriptionRestore Public Trust submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Transportation for records pertaining to Secretary Elaine Chao. The first FOIA request was for records of communications between DOT officials and the Foremost Group. The second FOIA request was for the costs associated with Chao's travel expenses. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, Restore Public Trust filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6176227) filed by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons as to USAO, # 5 Summons as to AG, # 6 Summons as to DOT)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-11Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-114STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/11/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-255REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST.(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-266SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (tth) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-07-087NOTICE of Appearance by John Cuong Truong on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-098RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/11/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/11/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/17/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 7/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration as to USAO and AG, # 2 Declaration as to DOT)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-119Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, and set Joint Status Report Deadline by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendant's 9 Consent Motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant shall file an Answer to the Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 12, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 16, 2019. The Report should address, among other things, the status of the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by the Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. Counsel is warned to strictly comply with the Court's 4 Standing Order, including its provisions governing motions for an extension of time. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/11/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/16/2019. (tg) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 8/12/2019. (tg) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar