Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP v. FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01690
Date Filed2019-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffWOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Womble Bond Dickinson, which represents rural carriers, submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Communications Commission for records concerning a consent order and decree against T-Mobile. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the law firm that T-Mobile had claimed that much of its submissions were confidential. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-101COMPLAINT TO ENFORCE FOIA REQUEST against FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (FCC) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6177576) filed by WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Hinger, Cathy) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-11Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-112ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) Modified on 6/21/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-123STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/12/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-21NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error. Summons re-issued with seal for today's date. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-214SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-07-195Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar