Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01691
Date Filed2019-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, a research fellow at the Cato Institute, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI and the National Archives and Records Administration for records pertaining to Richard Masayuki Kotoshirodo, a deceased Japanese-American. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The FBI told Eddington that it found no records and that any FBI records would have been transferred to NARA. Eddington had also requested expedited processing from NARA. NARA denied his request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Eddington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-101COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6177626) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-102NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-11Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-113SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-07-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/20/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 6/18/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/20/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/20/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/20/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar