Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union et al v. United States Department Of Justice et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv05483
Date Filed2019-06-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ronnie Abrams
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Case DescriptionThe American Civil Liberties Union submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning grants for gang suppression programs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantOffice of Justice Programs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-121COMPLAINT against Department Of Justice, Office of Justice Programs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17068117)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Hinger, Sarah) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-122CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hinger, Sarah) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-123RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union.(Hinger, Sarah) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-124RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(Hinger, Sarah) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-125FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Department Of Justice. (Hinger, Sarah) Modified on 6/12/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-126REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of Justice Programs, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Hinger, Sarah) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-127FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Hinger, Sarah) Modified on 6/13/2019 (pc). (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-128NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua David Riegel on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Riegel, Joshua) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-13***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sarah Hinger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Department Of Justice, Office of Justice Programs, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error ; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-13***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Sarah Hinger to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-13***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sarah Hinger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-13CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-13Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-13Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-139ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of Justice Programs. (pc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-13***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Sarah Hinger to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons; Party name on summons and docket entry must exactly match party name on complaint caption title (United States Department of Justice);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1310CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hinger, Sarah) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1311REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Hinger, Sarah) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1312NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher T Dunn on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Dunn, Christopher) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1313NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Belsher on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Belsher, Amy) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1314NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Antony Philip Falconer Gemmell on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Gemmell, Antony) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1315NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Perry on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Perry, Jessica) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1316ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. Plaintiffs are directed to notify the Court when service has been executed on Defendants, after which the Court will promptly schedule an initial conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/13/2019) (ama) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1417ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice. (dnh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-1418FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 19 Summons Returned Executed) - SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Office of Justice Programs served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; United States Department of Justice served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahearn. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Belsher, Amy) Modified on 6/18/2019 (db). (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-1719SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahearn, Civil Clerk Supervisor. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Belsher, Amy) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-2620ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/26/2019) (rj) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-0121AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order, ECF No. 20 served on United States Department of Justice and Office of Special Programs on 7/1/2019. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahearn, Civil Clerk. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Belsher, Amy) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-1222JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants, Jointly dated July 12, 2019 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(Hinger, Sarah) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-1523ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Office of Justice Programs, United States Department of Justice.(Cha-Kim, Stephen) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/19/2019. (arc) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar