Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleIoannides v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityWest Palm Beach
Case Number9:2019cv80785
Date Filed2019-06-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Donald M. Middlebrooks
PlaintiffTim Ioannides
Case DescriptionTim Ioannides submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning a qui tam action filed against Ioannides by the agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Ioannides that it had located 92 pages of responsive records. The agency only disclosed five pages. Ioannides filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Ioannides filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantUNITED STATES Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES Department of Justice. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11729545, filed by Tim Ioannides. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s))(Folley, Patrick) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-132Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-143Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice (jao) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-07-104CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tim Ioannides re 1 Complaint (Folley, Patrick) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-105SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed United States Department of Justice served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. See DE 4 for image. (pes) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-116Clerks Notice to Filer re 4 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 5 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. It is not necessary to refile this document. (pes) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-157Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint by United States Department of Justice. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Department of Justice(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-178PAPERLESS ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the government to respond to the Complaint is extended to August 23, 2019. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause supported by specific facts. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/17/2019. (kal) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar