Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJOHNSON v. UNITED STATES AIR FORCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01741
Date Filed2019-06-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffALLAN G. JOHNSON
Case DescriptionAllan Johnson submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of the Air Force for records concerning a variety of topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of his requests, Johnson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES AIR FORCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-141COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES AIR FORCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6189963) filed by ALLAN G. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-17Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-172SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-173STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/17/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-264AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against UNITED STATES AIR FORCE filed by ALLAN G. JOHNSON.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar