Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHELMER v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01744
Date Filed2019-06-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffJOHN HELMER Professor
Case DescriptionJohn Helmer submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning Zelman Crown, a former Governor General of Australia who served from 1977 to 1982. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Helmer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
201 Center Street, NW
DC, DC 20520
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-141COMPLAINT against JOHN HELMER U.S.DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6190093) filed by JOHN HELMER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Temkin, Maria) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-17Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-172SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-183ERRATA Complaint by JOHN HELMER 1 Complaint, filed by JOHN HELMER. (Temkin, Maria) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-264REQUEST to Issue Summons to U.S. Attorney General by JOHN HELMER (Temkin, Maria) Modified on 6/26/2019 to correct docket text (zjf). (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-265REQUEST to Issue Summons to U.S. Attorney's Office for D.C. by JOHN HELMER (Temkin, Maria) Modified on 6/26/2019 to correct docket text (jf). (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/24/2019 (Temkin, Maria) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-287SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-088GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/8/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-129NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-1710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/09/2019. (Temkin, Maria) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-1711RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/9/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/8/2019. (Temkin, Maria) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-1712RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/10/2019 (Temkin, Maria) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar