Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMCSMITH v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01760
Date Filed2019-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffDEREK LEROY MCSMITH
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-10Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/10/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE with Jury Demand filed by DEREK MCSMITH. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zmc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmc). (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-102MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEREK MCSMITH (zmc) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-243ORDER that within 20 days of entry of this order, the plaintiff either shall provide a full residence address, or shall file a motion to a post office box as the mailing address. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/24/2019. (zsb) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-07-084MOTION for Permission to Use Post Office Box by DEREK LEROY MCSMITH (zrdj) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar