Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01750
Date Filed2019-06-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records generated in connection with the agency's October 22, 2018 memorandum, "Changes in EPA Environmental Rating Process." CBD also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted CBD's request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-171COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6190872) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons DOJ AG, # 4 Summons EPA, # 5 Declaration Rule 26)(Lopes, Paulo) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-17Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Counsel/Party)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-304NOTICE of Appearance by William John Snape, III on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Snape, William) (Entered: 06/30/2019)
2019-07-035NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar