Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-06-17 | 1 | COMPLAINT filed by JAKE ADER; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15935866. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2019) |
2019-06-17 | 2 | ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JAKE ADER by Matthew Vincent Topic (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2019) |
2019-06-17 | | CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019) |
2019-06-18 | | SUMMONS Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ec, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-07-09 | 3 | DESIGNATION of Virginia Ovitz Hancock as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Hancock, Virginia) (Entered: 07/09/2019) |
2019-07-17 | 4 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jake Ader as to Federal Bureau of Investigation on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/17/2019) |
2019-07-17 | 5 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jake Ader as to U.S. Department of Justice on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/17/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice(Hancock, Virginia) (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-08-01 | 7 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on this court's form and deliver a courtesy copy to chambers by 8/14/2019. Status hearing set for 8/21/2019 at 9:10 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-08-01 | 8 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing set for 8/21/2019 is stricken and reset to 9/4/2019 at 9:10 a.m. Joint Status Report to be filed and delivered to chambers by 8/28/2019. Mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Joint Status Report) (cn). (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-08-28 | 9 | STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Hancock, Virginia) (Entered: 08/28/2019) |
2019-09-03 | 10 | ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jake Ader by Merrick Jason Wayne (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 09/03/2019) |
2019-09-04 | 11 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 9/4/2019 and continued to 10/3/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 09/04/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 12 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: At the parties' request and by agreement, status hearing set for 10/3/2019 is stricken and reset to 12/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-12-18 | 13 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: At the parties' request and by agreement, status hearing set for 12/19/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2020-02-28 | 14 | EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 20-0008 - Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on February 24, 2020 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable John F. Kness; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 313 cases be reassigned to the Honorable John F. Kness; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable John F. Kness' webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable John F. Kness to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that he shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable John F. Kness for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/28/2020.(tg, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020) |
2020-03-02 | 15 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing set for 8/18/2020 before Judge Gettleman is stricken. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
2020-03-09 | 16 | ORDER : STANDING ORDER REGARDING REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: This Standing Order applies to all civil cases reassigned as of February 28, 2020 to the calendar of District Judge John F. Kness. Unless otherwise ordered: (1) all previously-set status or motion hearing dates are vacated; (2) any trials or evidentiary hearings scheduled between March 9, 2020 and May 1, 2020 are continued and will be re-set by the Court at a future hearing; and (3) all other previously-set deadlines and schedules (other than hearing dates) shall remain in effect. See Order for details. Signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 3/9/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 03/09/2020) |
2020-03-16 | 17 | ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (td, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020) |
2020-03-30 | 18 | ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket13, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020) |
2020-04-24 | 19 | ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket5, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020) |
2020-04-30 | 20 | ORDER : STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL CASES. Signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 4/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020) |
2020-05-07 | 21 | STATUS Report Joint Status Report in Reassigned Case by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Hancock, Virginia) (Entered: 05/07/2020) |
2020-05-26 | 22 | ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket6, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020) |
2020-07-10 | 23 | ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk5, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020) |
2021-07-06 | 24 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Status hearing set for 7/21/2021 at 10:45 AM. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021) |
2021-07-21 | 25 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Telephonic status hearing held on 7/21/2021. The parties provided the Court with an update on the ongoing disclosure of documents by the FBI. According to government counsel, one final production is forthcoming. Plaintiff will review that production and provide an update on its view of the status of this litigation at the next hearing. A continued status hearing is set for 8/30/2021 at 10:15 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 07/22/2021) |
2021-08-30 | 26 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Telephonic status hearing held on 8/30/2021. Plaintiff's counsel reported that he and the Plaintiff are reviewing additional documents provided in response to the FOIA request and thus would prefer a continued status hearing. Accordingly, the status hearing is continued to 11/2/2021 at 10:15 AM; the parties shall use the same call-in information 24 . At that hearing, counsel should be prepared to discuss next steps in the litigation. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021) |
2021-10-28 | 27 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Status hearing set for 11/2/2021 at 10:15 AM is reset for 11/2/2021 at 10:10 AM. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021) |
2021-11-02 | 28 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Telephonic status hearing held on 11/2/2021. As discussed in open court, and on Plaintiff's unopposed oral motion to dismiss under FRCP 41(a)(2), this case is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 11/03/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |