Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCARDONA v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01783
Date Filed2019-06-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffROBERTO ANGEL CARDONA
Case DescriptionRoberto Cardona submitted three FOIA requests to the FBI and the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning the agency's investigation of racketeering and drug distribution charges against him. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but failed to respond. Cardona filed administrative appeals with the Office of Information Policy. However, after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Cardona filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
DefendantOFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-17Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/17/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-171COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY with Jury Demand filed by ROBERTO ANGEL CARDONA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-172MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERTO ANGEL CARDONA (zrdj) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-173PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ROBERTO ANGEL CARDONA (zrdj) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-07-034ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $149.51 from Prison Account of Roberto Angel Cardona and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/02/2019. (zmc) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-055SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-086Summons (3) Issued as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY. (zmc) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-127STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/12/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar