Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePITTS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01784
Date Filed2019-06-14
Date Closed2021-10-05
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffEDGAR NELSON PITTS
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantOFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
DefendantOFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [31]
Opinion/Order [35]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-14Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/14/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-141COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by EDGAR NELSON PITTS.(zrdj) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-142MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EDGAR NELSON PITTS (zrdj) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-143PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by EDGAR NELSON PITTS (zrdj) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-07-034ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $0 from Prison Account of EDGAR NELSON PITTS and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/02/2019. (zsb) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-095SUMMONS (7) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL served on 7/18/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/18/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/18/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/18/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/17/2019.) (jf) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-247NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-318RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 7/24/2019 (jf) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-129MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-14MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that defendants shall respond to the compliant by September 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/14/19. (DMK) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-09-1810MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Waller Decl. with Exhibits, # 4 Hardy Decl. with Exhibits, # 5 Glover Decl. with Exhibits)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-2211Order advising plaintiff to respond by 10/25/2019 to Defendants' 10 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/20/19. (ms) (Entered: 09/22/2019)
2019-09-3013ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Declaratory Relief by EDGAR NELSON PITTS (jf) Modified on 10/2/2019 (jf). (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-0112RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY served on 9/27/2019 (jf) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-02NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 13 MOTION for Declaratory Relief was entered in error and will be refiled in the correct case.(jf) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-0214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON served on 10/1/2019 (jf) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-2515Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EDGAR NELSON PITTS. "Leave to file GRANTED as a Opposition to Motion to Dismiss/Summary Affirmance" Signed by Amy B. Jackson, USDJ on 10/25/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(jf) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-0516MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-05MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that defendants shall file their reply by November 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/5/19. (DMK) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-1817REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-12-3118NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Damon Taaffe (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 12/31/2019)
2020-01-2719MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by EDGAR NELSON PITTS (jf) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-3020Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-02-1821REPLY to opposition re 19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by EDGAR NELSON PITTS. (jf) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-05-0122ERRATA by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 17 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-06-3023MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 10 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment; denying 19 19 plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction or temporary restraining order; and setting August 7, 2020 as the deadline for defendants' response to the remaining aspects of the complaint. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/30/20. (ms) Modified on 6/30/2020 to reflect that this is a Memorandum Opinion and Order (jth). (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file a renewed Summary Judgment motion, or other response to the remaining aspects of the complaint by 8/7/2020. (jth) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-08-0424MOTION for Extension of Time to File by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 08/04/2020)
2020-08-05MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' 24 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants shall file their response by October 21, 2020. Given the length of this extension of time, this deadline will not be extended again without a showing of extraordinary circumstances beyond "the press of other matters." Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/5/20. (psu2) (Entered: 08/05/2020)
2020-08-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file a renewed Summary Judgment Motion, or other response to the remaining aspects of the complaint by 10/21/2020. (jth) (Entered: 08/05/2020)
2020-10-2125Renewed Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration (Glover), # 4 Declaration (Treadway), # 5 Declaration (Cain), # 6 Declaration (Kagle), # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-2226Order advising plaintiff to respond by 11/30/2020 to 25 Defendants' Renewed Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/22/20. (psu2) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-12-0827MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 25 Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment by EDGAR NELSON PITTS (zjf) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-11MINUTE ORDER granting 27 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to the renewed partial motion for summary judgment is due by January 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/11/20. (DMK) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2021-02-0828RESPONSE re 25 Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EDGAR NELSON PITTS. (zjf) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-1229MOTION for Extension of Time to File by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-22MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 29 Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED, and the Reply is due by March 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/22/21. (psu2) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-22Set/Reset Deadline: Defendants' Reply in Support of their 25 Renewed Partial Motion for Summary Judgment is due by March 17, 2021. (jth) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-03-1730REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-05-2831MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting Defendants' Renewed Partial Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 25, and setting July 2, 2021, as the deadline for a motion regarding the Civil Rights Division's response to plaintiffs FOIA request. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/28/21. (psu2) (Entered: 05/28/2021)
2021-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants motion regarding the Civil Rights Divisions response to plaintiffs FOIA request due by 7/22/2021. (tb) (Entered: 06/01/2021)
2021-07-0232Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 07/02/2021)
2021-07-0633Order advising plaintiff to respond by 8/6/2021 to 32 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/6/21. (psu2) (Entered: 07/06/2021)
2021-10-0534ORDER granting 32 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/4/21. (psu2) (Entered: 10/05/2021)
2021-10-0535MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/4/21. (psu2) (Entered: 10/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar