Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSamuel v. U.S. Department of State
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityCharleston
Case Number2:2019cv01786
Date Filed2019-06-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Richard M Gergel
PlaintiffRobert T Samuel, III
Case DescriptionRobert Samuel submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the electromagnetic pulses known as the Cuba Condition that had caused hearing loss problems for State Department employees stationed at the U.S. Embassy in Havana. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Samuel to modify his request. He did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-241COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX200016462.), filed by Robert T Samuel, III. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents)(hada, ) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-243Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert T Samuel, III.(hada, ) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-128ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/12/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-129Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of State. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 10/10/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-1210***DOCUMENT MAILED 9 Summons Issued as to USA, 8 Order Service - Non-Inmate placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417 (egra, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar