Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSamuel v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityCharleston
Case Number2:2019cv01787
Date Filed2019-06-24
Date Closed2020-06-10
JudgeHonorable Richard M Gergel
PlaintiffRobert T Samuel, III
Case DescriptionRobert Samuel submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the investigation of two complaints he submitted. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Samuel filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 12
Opinion/Order [30]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-241COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX200016462.), filed by Robert T Samuel, III. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents)(hada, ) Modified on 7/3/2019 Additional Attachments 6 and 12 filed (egra, ). (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-244Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert T Samuel, III.(hada, ) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-036Additional Attachments to Main Document 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents, # 2 Envelope) (egra, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-129ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/12/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-1210Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 10/10/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-1211***DOCUMENT MAILED 9 Order Service - Non-Inmate, 10 Summons Issued as to USA placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417 (egra, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-2312Additional Attachments to Main Document 1 Complaint, First attachment description: Supporting Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (egra, ) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-08-1313SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert T Samuel, III. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Envelope) (egra, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-2014ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-08-2216SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to amend pleadings 9/20/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/21/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/21/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/21/2019, Discovery due by 12/20/2019, Motions due by 2/20/2020, Mediation Due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 08/22/2019. (egra, ) Modified on 8/22/2019 to edit docket text (egra, ). (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-2217***DOCUMENT MAILED 16 Scheduling Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417 (egra, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-10-3018MOTION to Compel by Robert T Samuel, III. Response to Motion due by 11/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Supporting Documents, # 3 Envelope)Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(egra, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-11-1319RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Compel Response filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/20/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-2220TEXT ORDER denying 18 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Plaintiff failed to properly serve his discovery requests. See Rule 5(b)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P. Plaintiff may re-serve his discovery requests if Defendants affidavits are found insufficient by the Court. Cf. Weisberg v. Dept of Justice, 627 F.2d 365, 371 (D.C. Cir. 1980); Landmark Legal Foundation v. EPA, 959 F.Supp.2d 175, 183 (D.D.C. 2013). Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 11/22/2019.(egra, ) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-11-2221***DOCUMENT MAILED 20 Order on Motion to Compel,, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417 (egra, ) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-12-2022MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Response to Motion due by 1/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hardy)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2020-01-0223ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Summary Judgment by 2/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 01/02/2020. (egra, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-01-0224***DOCUMENT MAILED 23 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417 (egra, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-01-0625RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Robert T Samuel, III. Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents, # 2 Envelope) (egra, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-05-0427REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant re 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. It is recommended that the Defendant's motion for summary judgment be granted, and that this case be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 05/04/2020. (cpeg, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-0428***DOCUMENT MAILED 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417 (cpeg, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-2129OBJECTION to 27 Report and Recommendation by Robert T Samuel, III. Reply to Objections due by 6/4/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(cpeg, ) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-06-1030ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the R & R as the Order of the Court (Dkt. No. 27). Defendants motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and Plaintiffs case is DISMISSED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/10/20.(ltap, ) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar