Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01915
Date Filed2019-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted two FOIA requests to the Export-Import Bank for records concerning communications between named officials at the agency and pertaining to specific keywords. Cause of Action Institute also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantEXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES
811 Vermont Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20571
DefendantEXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Opinion/Order [37]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-261COMPLAINT against EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6215576) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Thompson, Jessica) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Thompson, Jessica) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-263NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-264NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Mulvey on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-28Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-285SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-286REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 2 Summons U.S. Att'y Gen.)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-027SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (znmw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-028SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (znmw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-029RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES served on 7/2/2019 (Thompson, Jessica) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-0210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/2/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/1/2019. (Thompson, Jessica) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-0211RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/02/2019. (Thompson, Jessica) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-1912NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-08-0113ANSWER to Complaint by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by August 15, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/01/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/15/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-1514Joint STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Thompson, Jessica) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 14 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by September 19, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/15/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2019 (znbn) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-09-1915Joint STATUS REPORT by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 15 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by October 18, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/19/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/18/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-10-0316NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. Attorney Jessica Lee Thompson terminated. (Thompson, Jessica) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-1817Joint STATUS REPORT by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 17 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by November 18, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/22/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2019. (nbn) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-3118NOTICE of Change of Address by Lee A. Steven (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-1819Joint STATUS REPORT by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 19 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by December 18, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/18/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/18/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-12-1820Joint STATUS REPORT by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 20 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by January 23, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/18/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2020-01-2321Joint STATUS REPORT by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-01-23MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 21 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by March 6, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/23/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-03-0322Joint STATUS REPORT by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 22 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by April 14, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/3/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/14/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-04-1323NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-04-1424Joint STATUS REPORT by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-14MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 24 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by May 29, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/14/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-05-2925Joint STATUS REPORT by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 25 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by June 12, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/29/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/12/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-1226Joint STATUS REPORT by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 26 Joint Status Report and proposed briefing schedule. The Court further ORDERS that: (1) Defendant will file its Motion for Summary Judgment on the issues agreed upon by the parties by August 3, 2020; (2) Plaintiff will file its Opposition and any Cross-Motion by September 21, 2020; (3) Defendant will file its Reply and any Cross-Opposition by October 26, 2020; and Plaintiff will file its Cross-Reply by November 30, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/15/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 8/3/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/21/2020. Cross Motions due by 9/21/2020. Response to Cross Motions due by 10/26/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/26/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 11/30/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-08-0327MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A - Vaughn Index, # 5 Exhibit B - Confidentiality Memo, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-09-2128Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts Pl.'s SUMF, # 3 Statement of Facts Pl.'s Resp. to Def.'s SUMF, # 4 Declaration of Ryan P. Mulvey, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-2129Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-10-2130Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-21MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 30 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its Reply and Cross-Opposition by November 9, 2020; and 2) Plaintiff shall file its Cross-Reply by December 14, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/21/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 11/9/2020. Response to Cross Motions due by 11/9/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 12/14/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-11-0931Memorandum in opposition to re 28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Jackson Supp, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-0932REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jackson Supp)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-12-1433REPLY to opposition to motion re 28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2021-01-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by January 22, 2021, Defendant shall deliver to the Court for in camera review clean and redacted copies of all the documents disputed in the parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/19/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19Set/Reset Deadlines: In-Camera Submission due by 1/22/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-2234Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Deliver Documents for in camera Review by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-22MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 34 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that by January 29, 2021, Defendant shall deliver to the Court for in camera review clean and redacted copies of all the documents disputed in the parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/22/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-22Set/Reset Deadlines: In-Camera Submission due by 1/29/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-2935NOTICE or Delivery for In Camera Review by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES re Order, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-02-2336ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant's 27 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 2) Plaintiff's 28 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 3) Defendant shall provide Plaintiff the documents that the accompanying Memorandum Opinion identifies for release by March 2, 2021; 4) Defendant shall review all remaining records in accordance with the accompanying Memorandum Opinion; and 5) The parties shall submit a joint status report by March 9, 2021, containing proposals for resolving what remains of this case. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/23/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-02-2337MEMORANDUM OPINION re 36 Order on Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/23/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-02-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall provide Plaintiff the documents that the accompanying Memorandum Opinion identifies for release by 3/2/2021. Joint Status Report due by 3/9/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-03-0938Joint STATUS REPORT by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-09MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 38 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that: 1) By April 6, 2021, Defendant shall reprocess and produce non-exempt records to Plaintiff in accordance with the Court's February 23, 2021, Order; 2) By April 13, 2021, Defendant shall provide Plaintiff a revised Vaughn Index; and 3) By April 26, 2021, the parties shall file a further joint status report. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/9/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall reprocess and produce non-exempt records to Plaintiff in accordance with the Court's February 23, 2021, Order by 4/6/2021. Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar