Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFARMWORKER JUSTICE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01946
Date Filed2019-06-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffFARMWORKER JUSTICE
Case DescriptionFarmworker Justice submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning the agency's H-2A program and an interagency working group on the H2-A program including Agriculture and a number of other agencies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Farmworker Justice prioritized the type of records it wanted from the agency. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Farmworker Justice filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [27]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6222317) filed by FARMWORKER JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (U.S. Attorney), # 3 Summons (Attorney General), # 4 Summons (Agency))(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/2/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FARMWORKER JUSTICE (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-013NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Kirkpatrick on behalf of FARMWORKER JUSTICE (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-02Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zeg) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-024SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/2/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/1/2019. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July 8, 2019. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-08-017ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(Truong, John) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-05MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before August 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 5, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-268Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before October 9, 2019 that addresses the status of the case and, if necessary, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 26, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-10-099Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Truong, John) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 19, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 10, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-11-2010Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 19, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 20, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-12-1911Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before February 25, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 20, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2020-02-2512Joint STATUS REPORT by FARMWORKER JUSTICE. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-02-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 10, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 27, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-04-0213NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FARMWORKER JUSTICE. Attorney Patrick D. Llewellyn terminated. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-1014Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 04/10/2020)
2020-04-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before May 28, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 15, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-05-2815Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: the defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment on or before July 27, 2020; the plaintiff shall file an opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before August 27, 2020; the defendant shall file a reply and an oppsition to the plaintiff's cross-motion on or before September 28, 2020; and the plaintiff shall file a reply on or before October 13, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 29, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-07-2216Unopposed MOTION to Modify May 29, 2020 Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-23MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 16 Unopposed Motion to Modify. Accordingly, the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: the defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment on or before August 12, 2020; the plaintiff shall file an opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before September 14, 2020; the defendant shall file a reply and an oppsition to the plaintiff's cross-motion on or before October 14, 2020; and the plaintiff shall file a reply on or before October 29, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 23, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-08-1217MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Alexis Graves, # 4 Attachment C (Vaughn Index), # 5 Declaration of Donald E. "Skeetter" McCorkle, Jr.)(Truong, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: # 6 Exhibit) (zeg). (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-09-1418Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with Memorandum in Support, Response to Defendant's Statement of Facts and Cross-Statement of Facts by FARMWORKER JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael T. Kirkpatrick with Exhibits 1-3, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-1419Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Response to Defendant's Statement of Facts and Cross-Statement of Facts filed by FARMWORKER JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael T. Kirkpatrick with Exhibits 1-3, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-2120NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Marcy Zieve on behalf of FARMWORKER JUSTICE (Zieve, Allison) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-10-1221Consent MOTION to Modify July 23, 2020 Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Truong, John) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-12MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 21 Consent Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule. Accordingly, the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: the defendant shall file its reply and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment on or before October 21, 2020; plaintiff shall file its reply on or before November 9, 2020. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 12, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-2022Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Truong, John) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-21MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 22 Consent Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule. Accordingly, the defendant shall file its reply and opposition to plaintiffs cross-motion for summary judgment on or before October 28, 2020; plaintiff shall file any reply on or before November 16, 2020. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 21, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-2823REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Joseph L. Parsons)(Truong, John) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-2824Memorandum in opposition to re 18 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with Memorandum in Support, Response to Defendant's Statement of Facts and Cross-Statement of Facts (See ECF No. 23 for attachments) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-11-1625REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with Memorandum in Support, Response to Defendant's Statement of Facts and Cross-Statement of Facts filed by FARMWORKER JUSTICE. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2021-03-0426ORDER denying the defendant's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part the plaintiff's 18 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties are directed to file a proposed schedule for further proceedings on or before March 12, 2021. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 4, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-0427MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 4, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-1228Joint PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Truong, John) Modified event title on 3/15/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 28 Joint Notice of Proposed Briefing Schedule, it is ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: the defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before April 19, 2021; the plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before May 19, 2021; the defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before June 18, 2021; and the plaintiff's Reply shall be due on or before July 2, 2021. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 15, 2021. (lcdlf3) (lcao) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 5/19/2021. Response to Cross Motions due by 6/18/2021. Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/2/2021. Summary Judgment motions due by 4/19/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/19/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/18/2021. (zjch, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar