Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMAGASSA v. TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01953
Date Filed2019-06-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffLASSANA MAGASSA
Case DescriptionLassana Magassa submitted a FOIA request to the Transportation Security Administration for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Magassa to resubmit and clarify his original request. Magassa did so. The agency disclosed 49 pages with redactions and withheld 182 pages entirely. Magassa filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency told Magassa that its response was its final decision. He then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantTRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-281COMPLAINT against TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6224098) filed by Lassana Magassa. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Requests for Summons)(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-02Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-022SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-093STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/09/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-104RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/8/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/7/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/09/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 7/9/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar