Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01977
Date Filed2019-07-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzfeed submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between the FBI field staff in Los Angeles and FamilyTreeDNA, Gene By Gene, MyHeritage or Parabon Nanolabs. Buzzfeed asked for both investigative and non-investigative files. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request and told Buzzfeed that the estimated search time would be 1,289 days. Buzzfeed then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-021COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6230372) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-022NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-023LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-054SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-125STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/12/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-08-066NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-09-117RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 7/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/16/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-119RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/16/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-1110RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/21/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/20/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-1811ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-10-02MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than November 8, 2019. The parties joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (4)Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each partys individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2019. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/8/2019. (mac) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-11-0812Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 12 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than January 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/12/2019. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020. (mac) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2020-01-2413NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by William J. Chang on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney JOSHUA ROGERS (Chang, William) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-2414Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Chang, William) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-27MINUTE ORDER. In view of 24 parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than April 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/27/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Joint Status Report due by 4/24/2020. (mac) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-04-2415Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Chang, William) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-04-24MINUTE ORDER. In view of 15 parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than June 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/24/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-04-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/24/2020. (mac) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-06-2416Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED, INC.. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-26MINUTE ORDER. In view of 16 parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than September 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/26/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2020. (mac) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-09-2417Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED, INC.. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-28MINUTE ORDER. In view of 17 parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than October 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/28/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2020 (mac) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-10-2318Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Chang, William) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-23MINUTE ORDER. In view of 18 parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than December 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/23/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/22/2020 (mac) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-11-0419NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney William Chang (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-12-2220Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-23MINUTE ORDER. In view of 20 parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than January 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/23/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2021 (mac) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2021-01-1921Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19MINUTE ORDER. In view of 21 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than February 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/19/2021. (lcegs1) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2021. (mac) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-02-1822Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-18MINUTE ORDER. In view of 22 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than March 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/18/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2021 (mac) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-03-2223Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-23MINUTE ORDER. In view of 23 Joint Status Report, the parties shall abide by the following briefing schedule: (1) Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgement and/or other dispositive motion by no later than July 15, 2021; (2) Plaintiff shall file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendants' motion by no later than August 16, 2021; (3) Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion and reply in support of Defendants' motion by no later than September 15, 2021; and (4) Plaintiff shall file its reply by no later than September 29, 2021. Further, the Court denies the parties' request for the Court to dispense with the filing of statements of facts as required by Local Civil Rule 7(h) and paragraph 13 of 5 the Court's Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/23/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Motion For Summary Judgement And/Or Other Dispositive Motion due by 7/15/2021. Plaintiff Cross-Motion For Summary judgment And Opposition To Defendants' Motion due by 8/16/2021. Defendants Opposition To Plaintiff's cross-motion And Reply In Support Of Defendants' Motion due by 9/15/2021. Plaintiff Reply due by 9/29/2021. (mac) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar