Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMcKenzie-El v. Internal Revenue Service et al
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2019cv01956
Date Filed2019-07-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ellen L. Hollander
PlaintiffRiker McKenzie-El
Case DescriptionRiker McKenzie-El filed suit against the IRS challenging its attempt to collect $95,729 in back taxes. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
DefendantDavid Kautter in his official capacity as Acting Commissioner
DefendantAnn Willis in her official capacity as Operations Manager
DefendantChristine Davis in her official capacity as Operations Manager
DefendantUnited States of America
DefendantPorts America Chesapeake, LLC
DefendantSteamship Trade Assn/International Longshoremen's Assn (STA)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-021COMPLAINT against Christine Davis, Internal Revenue Service, David Kautter, Ports America Chesapeake, LLC, Steamship Trade Assn/International Longshoremen's Assn (STA), United States of America, Ann Willis filed by Riker McKenzie-El. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637116149) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-022MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Riker McKenzie-El. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-023ORDER DIRECTING that until plaintiff files the returns of service, the Court will not consider 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/2/2019. (c/m) (cc:AUSA Loucks) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/3/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-034CORRECTED ORDER DIRECTING that until plaintiff files the returns of service, the Court will not consider 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/3/2019. (c/m) (cc:AUSA Loucks) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/3/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-085CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Riker McKenzie-El re 3 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-166Correspondence re: Tampering, Destruction of U.S. Postal Service Mail by Riker McKenzie-El. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar