Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTROTTER v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02008
Date Filed2019-07-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffFREDERICK C. TROTTER
Case DescriptionFrederick Trotter submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning email addresses for the contact person for an individual or organization of eligible providers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Trotter that it had identified responsive records but would not disclose them. Trotter then filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Trotter filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [32]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-051COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6236647) filed by FREDERICK C. TROTTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-102CIVIL COVER SHEET by FREDERICK C. TROTTER filed by FREDERICK C. TROTTER.(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-11Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zeg) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-08-094Joint MOTION to Stay by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-095ORDER granting 4 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed until November 4, 2019, by which time the parties shall file a Joint Status Report advising of proposed further steps for this case. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/09/2019. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/4/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
2019-10-306Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES. (Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-307Joint MOTION to Stay re 5 Order on Motion to Stay (seeking continuation of stay) by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-318ORDER granting 7 Joint Motion to Continue Stay. The stay of this case is continued until February 7, 2020, by which time the parties shall file a Joint Status Report advising of proposed further steps for this case. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/31/2019. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2020-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/9/2020. Case Stayed. (nbn) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-079Joint MOTION to Stay re 5 Order on Motion to Stay, 8 Order on Motion to Stay, (seeking continuation of stay) and combined Joint Status Report by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-0710Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES. (Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-1411ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/13/2020. (lcrcl1) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-04-0912Joint STATUS REPORT and combined Joint Motion to Continue Stay by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES. (Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 04/09/2020)
2020-04-0913Joint MOTION to Stay re 11 Order on Motion to Stay and combined Joint Status Report by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 04/09/2020)
2020-04-1014ORDER granting 13 Joint Motion to Continue Stay. The stay of this case is continued until June 11, 2020, by which time the parties shall file a Joint Status Report advising of proposed further steps for this case. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/10/2020. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 04/10/2020)
2020-04-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 04/10/2020)
2020-06-1015Joint MOTION to Stay re 14 Order on Motion to Stay, by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-1016Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES. (Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-1217ORDER granting 15 Motion to Stay. The stay of this case is continued until September 11, 2020, by which time the parties shall file a Joint Status Report advising of proposed further steps for this case.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/12/2020. (lcmb) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-07-3018NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES Substituting for attorney Peter C. Pfaffenroth (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-09-0919Joint MOTION to Lift Stay re 17 Order on Motion to Stay,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-09-0920Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-09-1121ORDER granting 19 Motion to Lift Stay; Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 10/13/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion due by 11/13/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Cross Motion due by 12/11/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 1/15/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/11/2020. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-1622ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-10-1323MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Hugh Gilmore, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-11-1324Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FREDERICK C. TROTTER. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 7 Statement of Facts, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-1325Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by FREDERICK C. TROTTER (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 7 Statement of Facts, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-12-0826Unopposed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-0927ORDER granting 26 Motion to Modify. Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to Cross Motion and Reply due by 12/18/2020; Plaintiff's Reply to Cross Motion due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/09/2020. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-1828REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Frank Domizio, # 3 Declaration Supplemental Declaration - Hugh Gilmore, # 4 Declaration Carl Schell, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F)(Molen, Kathleene) Modified on 12/21/2020 to correct docket link (zjf). (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-1829Memorandum in opposition to re 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Frank Domizio, # 3 Declaration Supplemental Declaration - Hugh Gilmore, # 4 Declaration Carl Schell, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2021-01-2930REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FREDERICK C. TROTTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit V, # 2 Exhibit W, # 3 Exhibit X, # 4 Exhibit Y, # 5 Exhibit Z)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-02-0831ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 25 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; Set/Reset Deadlines: Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 3/10/2021; Fees Motion due by 4/24/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/08/2021. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-0832MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/08/2021. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar