Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSNOWDEN v. TRUMP et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02010
Date Filed2019-07-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffFABRICE SNOWDEN
DefendantDONALD TRUMP President, United States of America
DefendantWILLIAM P. BARR United States Attorney General, Department of Justice
DefendantSUSAN B. GERSON Assistant Director, Office of the United States Attorneys
DefendantJOHN DOE Associate Director, Office of Information Policy
DefendantDAVID L. HARLOW Deputy Director, United States Marshal Service
DefendantWILLIAM E. BORDLEY Associate General Counsel, United States Marshal Service
DefendantJOHN DOE Director of the Bureau of Prisons, Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-01Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/1/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zjd) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-011COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR, WILLIAM E. BORDLEY, JOHN DOE(Director of the Bureau of Prisons, Department of Justice), JOHN DOE(Associate Director, Office of Information Policy), SUSAN B. GERSON, DAVID L. HARLOW, DONALD TRUMP filed by FABRICE SNOWDEN. (Attachment: # 1 Envelope)(zjd) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-012MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FABRICE SNOWDEN. (zjd) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-243PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/22/2019. (zsb) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar