Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCitizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy, Safe and Peaceful Environment et al v. United States Department of the Navy
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2019cv01041
Date Filed2019-07-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Marsha J. Pechman
PlaintiffCitizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy Safe and Peaceful Environment
PlaintiffRobert Wilbur
PlaintiffMaryon Attwood
Case DescriptionCitizens of the Ebey Reserve submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of the Navy for records concerning sampling for chemical components of aqueous film-forming foam adjacent to Naval Air Station Whidbey Island. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after the agency failed to respond, Citizens of the Ebey Reserve filed administrative appeals. The agency told Citizens of the Ebey that it was closing their appeals so that the agency could process and respond to their original requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens of the Ebey filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of the Navy a military department of the United States, an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-051CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve (Griefen, Zachary) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-082COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States Department of the Navy Attorney Zachary Knox Griefen added to party Maryon Attwood(pty:pla), Attorney Zachary Knox Griefen added to party Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve(pty:pla), Attorney Zachary Knox Griefen added to party Wilbur Robert(pty:pla), filed by Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve, Maryon Attwood, Wilbur Robert. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Griefen, Zachary) (Fee Paid, Receipt #0981-5833936) Modified on 7/8/2019 to add Receipt # (KB). (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-083PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 2 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Maryon Attwood, Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve, Wilbur Robert (Griefen, Zachary) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-08Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-084NOTICE TO FILER: re 2 Complaint,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-085NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David A Bricklin on behalf of Plaintiffs Maryon Attwood, Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy, Safe and Peaceful Environment, Robert Wilbur. (Bricklin, David) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-096Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States Department of the Navy. (PM) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-09Attorney Claudia Newman added for Maryon Attwood, Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy, Safe and Peaceful Environment, and Robert Wilbur per 5 Notice of Appearance. (PM) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-177AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States Department of the Navy, filed by Citizens of the Ebey's Reserve for a Healthy Safe and Peaceful Environment, Maryon Attwood, Robert Wilbur.(Griefen, Zachary) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar