Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES v. US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02018
Date Filed2019-07-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES
Case DescriptionThe Center for Immigration Studies submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning intake and removal data. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked CIS to narrow the scope of its request. CIS declined to do so, contending that the request was sufficiently clear to allow a search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CIS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-081COMPLAINT against US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6237258) filed by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Defendant, # 3 Summons for Attorney General, # 4 Summons for US Attorney)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-10Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-08-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/22/2019. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/23/2019. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 7/22/2019 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar