Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02020
Date Filed2019-07-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW
Case DescriptionU.S. Right to Know submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State for records to or from agency employees in Europe containing the word "glyphosate." U.S. Right to Know also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, U.S. Right to Know filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6238386) filed by U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons AG, # 3 Summons USA, # 4 Summons Dept of State)(Joshi, Nandan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/10/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW (Joshi, Nandan) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-103NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Llewellyn on behalf of U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-10Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zeg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-114STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/11/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-115SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/11/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/10/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Copy of Summons Served)(Joshi, Nandan) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-117ERRATA by U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW 6 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney,. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons Served)(Joshi, Nandan) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-08-128ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-12MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before September 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/12/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Briefing scheduled, if required, due by 9/12/2019. (tg) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar