Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOBIAS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02023
Date Filed2019-07-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffJIMMY TOBIAS
Case DescriptionJimmy Tobias, an independent reporter, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning communications sent to or from Bureau of Land Management official Kathleen Benedetto pertaining to various protected federal lands. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the requests, Tobias filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6239994) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Civil Cover Sheet, # 26 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-082NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-10Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zeg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-08-064NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-215NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-216ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-227VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED 10/3/2019.....ORDER directing the government to produce a Vaughn index and supporting dispositive motion within 30 days in accordance with Local Rule 16.3(b)(10). Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/22/2019. (lcrcl3) Modified on 10/4/2019 (lsj). (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index and supporting Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-09-188RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY served on 7/22/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-189RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/23/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-1810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/22/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-2311Consent MOTION to Vacate Dispositive Motion Deadline by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-10-03MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 11 Consent Motion to Vacate Dispositive Motion Deadline. The Court's August 22, 2019 Order directing defendant to produce a Vaughn Index and supporting dispositive motion within 30 days is hereby vacated. The parties shall file a joint status report every 60 days until the production is complete. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/03/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-12-0212NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-0213Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-04STATUS REPORT MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report no later than 01/31/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/04/2019. (lcrcl3) Modified event title on 12/5/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2020-01-1714NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. Attorney Darrell C. Valdez terminated. (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-3115Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-05MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report no later than 03/31/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/05/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/31/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-03-3116Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-04-02MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 06/01/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/02/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-06-0117Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-02MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 08/03/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/02/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-08-0318Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-04MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 10/02/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/04/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/04/2020)
2020-10-0219Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-02MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 12/01/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/02/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-12-1120Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-11MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 2/9/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/11/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/9/2021 (lsj) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2021-02-0921Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-09MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 4/12/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/9/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/12/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-04-1222Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar