Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSavoca v. United States Department of Justice, et al.
DistrictNorthern District of Ohio
CityCleveland
Case Number1:2019cv01545
Date Filed2019-07-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Sara Lioi
PlaintiffThomas J. Savoca
Case DescriptionThomas Savoca, who had been indicted for bank robbery, requested records from the Department of Justice concerning his case. After the agency failed to provide records, Savoca filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantExecutive Office of the United States Attorney's
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-081Complaint against Executive Office of the United States Attorney's, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Thomas J. Savoca. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1- Letter from Dept of Justice, # 3 Exhibit Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit Letter from Sheriff of Jackson County, # 5 Exhibit Letter to Traders Bank, # 6 Exhibit 5- US Dept of Justice Documents, # 7 Exhibit 6- Docket and Partial Transcript) (Y,A) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-08Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-08Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-08Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of the second page of the Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the entire Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court., Copy of complaint and a blank civil cover sheet mailed to Thomas J. Savoca at P.O. Box 2000, Bruceton Mills, WV 26525 on 7/8/19. (Y,A) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-18Filing fee was not paid and no IFP Motion was provided. A blank IFP Form was mailed to Thomas J Savoca #20970-008 at Hazelton P.O. Box 2000, Bruceton Mills, WV 26525 on 7/18/19. Related document(s) 1 . (Y,A) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-182Civil Cover sheet 1 filed by Thomas J. Savoca. Related document(s) 1 . (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(S,KM) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-183Order : Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall either (1) pay the filing fee of $400.00, or (2) complete and file an application to proceed in forma pauperis; failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Financial Application)(S,AA) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-18Copy of 3 Order mailed to Plaintiff, Thomas J. Savoca, #20970-008, Hazelton P.O. Box 2000, Bruceton Mills, WV 26525 on 7/18/2019. (S,AA) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-08-084Motion to be brought forth for Evidence hearings filed by Plaintiff Thomas J. Savoca. (W,CM) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-165Affidavit of prisoner filed by Plaintiff Thomas J. Savoca. (W,Jo) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar