Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNorthwest Environmental Advocates v. US Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2019cv01051
Date Filed2019-07-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James L. Robart
PlaintiffNorthwest Environmental Advocates an Oregon non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionNorthwest Environmental Advocates submitted FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning actions by the agency and the Washington Department of Ecology pertaining to nutrient pollution in Puget Sound. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Northwest Environmental Advocates filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Environmental Protection Agency an agency of the United States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [9]
Opinion/Order [11]
Opinion/Order [14]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-081COMPLAINT against defendant(s) U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (Receipt # 0981-5836015), filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-082CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-09Judge James L. Robart added. (GT) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-093Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant US Environmental Protection Agency. (GT) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-294AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to US Environmental Protection Agency on 7/17/2019, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-08-165NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant US Environmental Protection Agency. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-166ANSWER to 1 Complaint by US Environmental Protection Agency.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-207ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/17/2019. (AD) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-09-03Reset Deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is extended to 9/23/2019; Initial Disclosure Deadline is extended 10/15/2019. (AD) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-248STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to extend JSR deadline by parties (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-279STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of deadline re parties' 8 Stipulation. Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-10-0110STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to vacate schedule and setting deadlines by parties (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-0711ORDER granting parties' 10 Joint Motion for Entry of Order Setting Deadlines. All existing case deadlines are vacated. Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 5/20/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2020-05-1412JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 0. (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-07-0313Stipulated MOTION Joint Status Report and Proposed Order , filed by Defendant US Environmental Protection Agency. Noting Date 7/3/2020, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 07/03/2020)
2020-07-0614JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER per parties' 13 Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 7/25/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-2415JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 0. (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-08-1416Stipulated MOTION to Set Deadline and Joint Status Report , filed by Defendant US Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Setting Deadline) Noting Date 8/14/2020, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-1717ORDER SETTING DEADLINE re Parties' 16 Stipulated Motion. The parties shall submit either a stipulated motion for in camera review or a proposed briefing schedule for cross-motions for summary judgment by September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(LH) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-09-0418Stipulated MOTION Joint Status Report and Proposed Order , filed by Defendant US Environmental Protection Agency. Noting Date 9/4/2020, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-0619JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER per Parties' 18 Stipulated Motion. Joint Status Report due by 11/3/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar