Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSIMMONS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02058
Date Filed2019-07-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffSAMARA L. A. SIMMONS
Case DescriptionSamara Simmons submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State for a list of specific records pertaining to her. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, Simmons filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6247167) filed by SAMARA L. A. SIMMONS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Deming, Stuart) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-12Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-313NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael King on behalf of SAMARA L. A. SIMMONS (King, J. Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-164NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-195ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
2019-08-28MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 10/4/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/28/19. (DJS) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2019. (tb) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-306AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by SAMARA L. A. SIMMONS.(Deming, Stuart) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-09-137Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-208Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-22MINUTE ORDER: Granting nunc pro tunc 7 Motion for Extension of Time File Answer; Granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer due September 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/22/19. (DJS) (Entered: 09/22/2019)
2019-09-239ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/23/2019. (tb) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-2410NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Hansen on behalf of SAMARA L. A. SIMMONS (Hansen, Peter) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-10-0411Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-15MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 9 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report and proposed order by November 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/15/19. (DJS) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/22/2019. (tb) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-11-2212Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-11-2213Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by SAMARA L. A. SIMMONS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint)(Deming, Stuart) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-11-26MINUTE ORDER: Granting 13 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/19. (DJS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-12-02MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 12 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by January 30, 2020 and every 60 days thereafter. A proposed order shall be included to the extent the report contains a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/2/19. (DJS) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2020. (tb) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-0314AMENDED COMPLAINT against SAMARA L. A. SIMMONS filed by SAMARA L. A. SIMMONS.(ztd) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-1715Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-18MINUTE ORDER: Granting 15 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint by December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/18/19. (DJS) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/20/2019. (tb) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-2016ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2020-01-3017Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar