Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCrespo v. F.B.I.
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2019cv22857
Date Filed2019-07-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Cecilia M. Altonaga
PlaintiffAlvaro de Jesus Crespo
Case DescriptionAlvaro de Jesus Crespo submitted a FOIA request to the FBI's Miami Field Office for records concerning himself. After the agency failed to respond, Crespo filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantF.B.I. Miami Field Office
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-111COMPLAINT against F.B.I. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ar2) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-112Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-113MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (ar2) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-114MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (ar2) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-125ORDER denying without prejudice 1 Complaint filed by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. Plaintiff has until July 24, 2019 to file an amended complaint that remedies the defects identified in this Order, along with the proper filing fee, or an affidavit to support proceeding without prepaying costs. If Plaintiff re-files an IFP Application, such affidavit must include an explanation of his lack of income, given Plaintiff lists a Miami address (see Compl. 1), while failing to disclose how he pays for necessities such as rent and food. All other pending motions are DENIED as premature. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-226AMENDED COMPLAINT against F.B.I., filed by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(cqs) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-227MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(cqs) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-228Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Alvaro de Jesus Crespo to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: alvarokrespo@hotmail.com (cqs) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-239ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-2410ORDER granting 7 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-3011ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-3012Summons Issued as to F.B.I.. (jao) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-3113ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to FBI, Miami Field Officer filed by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (mee) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-3114ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to U.S. Attorney's Office filed by Alvaro de Jesus Crespo. (mee) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar