Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02080
Date Filed2019-07-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning whether two acting heads of agency components had taken actions under various statutes that were statutorily delegated to a confirmed director and not an acting director. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told PEER that it could not respond within 20 days. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-121COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6252009) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Summons DOI Summons, # 3 Summons AG Summons, # 4 Summons USAO summons, # 5 Declaration 7.1 disclosure)(Jenkins, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zeg) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-16Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-244NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar