Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02081
Date Filed2019-07-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, a researcher at the Cato Institute, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the USA Freedom Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Eddington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6252017) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-122NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-16Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-08-064NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar