Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02139
Date Filed2019-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzfeed submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning communications with the U.S. Embassy in London pertaining to Alexander Perepilcheny, a Russian national who had died in 2012. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Buzzfeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6263193) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-182NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-183LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-19Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-194SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-08-065NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar