Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02169
Date Filed2019-07-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State and the CIA for records concerning emails sent to or from Mike Pompeo as Secretary of State or as the former director of the CIA. American Oversight also submitted two requests to the Department of State and the CIA for records concerning communications between Pompeo or his staff and Senator Tom Cotton (R-AR) or Marco Rubio (R-FL). American Oversight submitted another FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning email chains sent to or from Pompeo from non-government email accounts. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-231COMPLAINT against U.S. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6271241) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-23Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zeg) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-233SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-08-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/23/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/22/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/29/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 8/9/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/29/2019 (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar