Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02255
Date Filed2019-07-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State for records. Its first FOIA request asked for communications between Jonathan Winer, and any employees of the FBI, the CIA, the Department of Defense, or the White House pertaining to a list of individuals related to the investigation of Russian interference in the 2016 election. Citizens United also requested expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Citizens United's request for expedited processing. Citizens United's second FOIA request asked for communications between Kathleen Kavalec, and any employees from the FBI, the CIA, the Defense Department or the White House pertaining to the same list of individuals related to the investigation of Russian interference in the 2016 election. Citizens United also requested expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Citizens United's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6284374) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Summons to the Attorney General, # 7 Summons to the State Dept, # 8 Summons to the US Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-29Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zjd) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-293SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-09-114NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-115ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-12MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) appear to be inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report by October 11, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 12, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-10-116Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by November 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 15, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar