Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02272
Date Filed2019-07-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted four FOIA requests to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning leadership communications, keyword communications, and complaints pertaining to the Brooklyn Metropolitan Center. The agency acknowledged receipt of all four requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-301COMPLAINT against U.S. BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6287442) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-302LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-08-01Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-013SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/31/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/5/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 8/5/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/5/2019 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
2019-08-195GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/19/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
2019-09-036NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-037Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response To Complaint And Joint Status Report by U.S. BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-11MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, nunc pro tunc. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/11/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar