Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2019cv03429
Date Filed2019-07-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mark H. Cohen
PlaintiffSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Southeastern Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning any finding that an attorney violated the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court rules in connection with obtaining a warrant to conduct surveillance of Carter Page. SLF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, SLF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-301COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8827310) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-302Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. (eop) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-303Electronic Summons Issued as to William P. Barr. (eop) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-304Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Attorney Office. (eop) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-305Certificate of Interested Persons by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-316STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION . Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/31/19. (bnw) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-05Clerks Notation re 5 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-127Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. United States Department of Justice served on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Department of Justice, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-288Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel) Modified on 8/28/2019 (adg). (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-289ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time through and including 11/11/2019 for United States Department of Justice to file a responsive pleading to the 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/28/2019. (adg) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-11-1210Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-1211ORDER Granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Department of Justice's Answer due 12/12/2019. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/12/19. (bjh) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-12-1212MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Brief In Support by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Williams, Samuel) (Entered: 12/12/2019)
2019-12-2313Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-2314ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to file response 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint through and including 1/9/2020. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/23/2019. (dob) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2020-01-0915RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kimberly S. Hermann)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-01-2316Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply re: 15 Response in Opposition to Motion with Brief In Support by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-01-2417ORDER Granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time through and including 2/6/20 to file a Reply to 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/24/20. (bjh) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-2918Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2/4/20, 2/10/20, 2/11/20, 2/14/20, 2/17/20, 2/18/20, 2/19/20, 2/20/20, 2/21/20, by Kimberly Stewart Hermann. (Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-3019NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Celia Howard on behalf of Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (Howard, Anna) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-02-0620REPLY BRIEF re 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Samuel) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-07Submission of 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint , to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bjh) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-03-2021GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-04-0222Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (aaq) (ADI) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-05-0423SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-2124Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Lisa D. Cooper replacing attorney Samuel Harrington Williams. (Cooper, Lisa) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-2725THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar