Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBLIXSETH v. UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02297
Date Filed2019-07-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffTIMOTHY BLIXSETH
Case DescriptionTimothy Blixseth submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Coast Guard for records concerning records from 2010 pertaining to Blixseth, the Piano Bar, and Yellowstone Aviation and Marine. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Blixseth that it conducted a search and found no records. Blixseth filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Blixseth filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES COAST GUARD
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-311COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES COAST GUARD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6292807) filed by TIMOTHY BLIXSETH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5)(Himes, Lisa) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/1/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-312NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by TIMOTHY BLIXSETH. Case related to Case No. 19-00593. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-313NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by TIMOTHY BLIXSETH. Case related to Case No. 18-02281. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-314NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by TIMOTHY BLIXSETH. Case related to Case No. 19-01292. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-01Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-015SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/5/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/4/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/5/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-068RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES COAST GUARD served on 8/6/2019 (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-09-049ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by September 19, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/05/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/19/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-1910NOTICE (Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule) by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 10 Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule and ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall file its dispositive motion on or before October 23, 2019; (2) Plaintiff shall file any opposition to Defendant's dispositive motion and any cross-motion on or before November 8, 2019; (3) Defendant shall file any reply and opposition to any cross-motion on or before November 27, 2019; and (4) Plaintiff shall file any reply to Defendant's opposition on or before December 10, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/19/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar