Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02306
Date Filed2019-08-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission and OMB for communications between the agencies and a list of trade associations pertaining to records concerning EEOC-1 Component 2 pay data. DFF also requested a fee waiver for both requests. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. EEOC told DFF that it could not respond within the statutory time limit. After hearing nothing further from either agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantEQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-011COMPLAINT against EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6295136) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-012LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Dubner, Jeffrey) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/2/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-02Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-023SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/8/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/09/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION served on 8/8/2019; OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 8/12/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-09-065NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Stelson Edney on behalf of EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-066Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-06MINUTE ORDER: Granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/6/19. (DJS) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 7, 2019. (jth) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-10-077ANSWER to Complaint by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar