Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02308
Date Filed2019-08-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Treasury for records concerning communications between Secretary Steve Mnuchin, Ivanka Trump, and Jared Kushner regarding Trump and Kushner's presence on Air Force planes, and any invitation to Mnuchin to vacation with Trump and/or Kushner. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told American Oversight that it would need to take a 10-day extension to respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-011ENTERED IN ERROR.....COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6294488) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of the Treasury)(Shaw, Khahilia) Modified on 8/2/2019 (zsb). (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-012ENTERED IN ERROR..... LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) Modified on 8/2/2019 (zsb). (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-02NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 1 Complaint,, 2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, was entered in error. Counsel for the Plaintiff is not a member of this court's bar. As a result the attorney is not permitted to practice in this court pursuant to LCvR 83.2. (zsb) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-053NOTICE of Appearance by Khahilia Y. Shaw on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/15/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-054COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6294488) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-055LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (jf) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-066REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Attorney Summons, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General Summons, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of the Treasury Summons)(Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-06Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zeg) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-067SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/6/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-198RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/6/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/5/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/12/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 8/12/2019 (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
2019-09-059ANSWER to 4 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-11MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) appear to be inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 7, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 11, 2019. (lccjn3) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar