Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGwich'in Steering Committee et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
DistrictDistrict of Alaska
CityAnchorage
Case Number3:2019cv00208
Date Filed2019-07-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeH. Russel Holland
PlaintiffGwich'in Steering Committee
PlaintiffAlaska Wilderness League
PlaintiffDefenders of Wildlife
PlaintiffThe Wilderness Society
Case DescriptionThe Gwich'in Steering Committee, the Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, and the Wilderness Society submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the Arctic Refuge. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after the agency failed to respond further, the organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of the Interior
DefendantU.S. Bureau of Land Management
DefendantU.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-311COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2736070.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-312Civil Cover Sheet. (Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-313Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Wilderness League. (Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-314Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defenders of Wildlife. (Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-315Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gwich'in Steering Committee. (Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-316Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Wilderness Society. (Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-317MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David A. Bahr. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2736174.) by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-318Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Department of the Interior, (Attachments: # 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Bureau of Land Management, # 2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-31Summons Issued as to U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-319Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Jenson, Maresa) Modified on 8/1/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-0110CLERK'S NOTICE re 7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Bahr, at docket 7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-1411SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Bureau of Land Management served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-1412SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Department of the Interior served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-1413SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar